Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1120737

EP1120737 - Optical security device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolic AG
Chamerstrasse 50
6301 Zug / CH
[2001/31]
Representative(s)Liebetanz, Michael , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/31]Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date00300610.327.01.2000
[2001/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1120737
Date:01.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/06, B42D15/10
[2001/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optische Fälschungssicherheit[2001/31]
English:Optical security device[2001/31]
French:Dispositif optique de sécurité[2001/31]
Examination procedure29.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/01]
11.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5)  [2002/01]
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO9852077  (SCHADT MARTIN ;ROLIC AG (CH); SEIBERLE HUBERT (DE)) [DA] 1-22 * page 8, line 24 - page 23, line 23 *;
 [DA]EP0689065  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [DA] 1-22 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 28 *;
 [A]EP0911758  (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 30; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0899119  (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 6 *