EP1026516 - Method and apparatus for analyzing an ultrasonic image of a carcass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Beef Technologies, Ltd. 311 North Arthur Amarillo Texas 79107 / US | [2006/40] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Micro Beef Technologies, Ltd. 311 North Arthur Amarillo, Texas 79107 / US | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states ANIMAL ULTRASOUND SERVICES, INC. 95 Brown Road, Box 0024 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Yujun 106 Woodshire Lane Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 02 /
Stouffer, James R. 116 Winston Drive Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | 03 /
Snider, Greg RR. No. 4, Box 227A Kearney, Nebraska 68847 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Jones, Graham H. Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300805.9 | 02.02.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | US19990245181 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: US 245181 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026516 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026516 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026516 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G06T7/60, A22B5/00, G06F19/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
A22B5/007 (EP,US);
G01N33/12 (EP,US);
G01S15/88 (EP,US);
G01S7/52036 (EP,US);
G01S7/539 (EP,US);
G06T7/60 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | G01S7/52, G01S7/539, G06T7/00, G01S15/88 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Analysieren eines Ultraschallbilds von Schlachttierkörpern | [2000/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for analyzing an ultrasonic image of a carcass | [2000/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour analyser une image ultrasonique d'une carcasse animale | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 16.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2006 | BE | 04.10.2006 | CH | 04.10.2006 | CY | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | FR | 04.10.2006 | IT | 04.10.2006 | LI | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | DE | 05.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | ES | 15.01.2007 | IE | 02.02.2007 | LU | 02.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
FR | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
DE | 05.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IE | 02.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
DE | 05.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IE | 02.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
DE | 05.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IE | 02.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
DE | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
IE | 02.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
DE | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
BE | 04.10.2006 | ||
CH | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
LI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 04.10.2006 | |
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0337661 (WILSON JOHN) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 3 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 31 *; | [AD]US5339815 (LIU YUJUN [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 11, line 6 - column 16, line 68 * * column 17, line 10 - column 18, line 4 * * column 18, line 11 - column 18, line 53 * * column 19, lines 17-22 *; | [A]DE19700212 (CSB SYST SOFTWARE ENTWICKLUNG [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * |