blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1026496

EP1026496 - Optical coupler for a moisture sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2001
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2001 [2001/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kadar-Kallem, Michael Aaron
4109 Lisa Drive
Harrisburg, PA 17112 / US
02 / Miller, Richard Dean
1209 Empire Circle
Lancaster, PA 17601 / US
03 / Rowlette, John Robert
431 Cook Court
Hummelstown, PA / US
04 / Weber, Ronald Martin
RD No. 1 Box 650
Annville, PA 17003 / US
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Warren, Keith Stanley, et al
Baron Warren Redfern
Cambridge House
100 Cambridge Grove
Hammersmith, London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Warren, Keith Stanley, et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date00300810.902.02.2000
[2000/32]
Priority number, dateUS1999024191202.02.1999         Original published format: US 241912
[2000/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1026496
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/43, B60S1/08
[2000/32]
CPC:
B60S1/0822 (EP); B60S1/0888 (EP); B60S1/0837 (EP);
G01N2201/021 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/17]
Former [2000/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Koppler für Feuchtigkeitssensor[2000/32]
English:Optical coupler for a moisture sensor[2000/32]
French:Coupleur optique pour un detecteur d'humidité[2000/32]
Examination procedure10.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/47]
19.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/47]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.03.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.03.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.03.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.03.2001M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5565978  (OKUBO SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 14; figure 3 * [Y] 4-9;
 [Y]US5262640  (PURVIS MICHAEL B [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * column 3, line 8 - line 21; figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US4676638  (YASUDA SHIGEKAZU [JP]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US4652745  (ZANARDELLI VANCE P [US]) [Y] 8 * column 5, line 1 - line 11; figure 5 *;
 [Y]US4246489  (YOSHIDA MITSUO, et al) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 6; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9527894  (KOLARI MATTI [FI]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.