Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1031913

EP1031913 - A communication terminal having a predictive editor application. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Williams, Stephen
Oraskuja 1 A3
33820 Tempere / FI
[2000/35]
Representative(s)van Walstijn, Gerard
Nordic Patent Service A/S
Højbro Plads 10
1200 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]van Walstijn, Bartholomeus Gerard G.
WIP / Walstijn Intellectual Property Parkovsvej 3
2820 Gentofte / DK
Former [2000/35]Jeffery, Kendra Louise
Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood
Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB
Application number, filing date00301072.511.02.2000
[2000/35]
Priority number, dateGB1999000401322.02.1999         Original published format: GB 9904013
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1031913
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1031913
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1031913
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023, H04M1/72
[2000/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   SE [2002/08]
Former [2000/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kommunikationsendgerät mit prädiktiver Editor-Anwendung[2000/35]
English:A communication terminal having a predictive editor application.[2000/35]
French:Terminal de communication possédant une application d'éditeur de texte prédictif[2000/35]
Examination procedure30.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
23.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2003Fee for grant paid
22.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02029094.6  / EP1296216
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DXY]WO9833111  (TEGIC COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [DX] 1-3,7-10 * page 9, line 24 - line 27 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 8 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 10 * * page 17, line 30 - page 18, line 23 * * page 26, line 16 - page 28, line 22 * * page 33, line 27 - page 35, line 21 * * page 36, line 14 - page 37, line 12 * * page 38, line 11 - line 24 * * page 39, line 18 - page 40, line 2 * [Y] 4-6;
 [X]WO9705541  (KING MARTIN T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 16 * * page 14, line 1 - line 13 * * page 21, line 23 - page 23, line 20 * * page 27, line 26 - page 29, line 10 * * page 30, line 21 - page 31, line 2 * * page 34, line 26 - line 29 *;
 [Y]US5838783  (CHENG FRANK S [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 7 *;
 [Y]US5742669  (LIM BOON-CHEN [HK]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 5 *;
 [A]EP0570116  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,2,4,7 * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0732646  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,7,10 * column 17, line 1 - line 42 * * column 21, line 6 - line 32 * * column 23, line 31 - column 24, line 19 *;
 [L]  "Nokia 3210 User's Guide", NOKIA, (1999), pages 39 - 41, URL: http://www.nokia.com/pdf/nokia_pickyaama.pdf, (20010320), XP002163603 [L] 1-10 * the whole document *