Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039385

EP1039385 - Semiconductor read-only memory device having means for replacing defective memory cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takata, Hidekazu
292-3, 3-chome, Minamikideracho
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date00301106.114.02.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateJP1999008277926.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8277999
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1039385
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039385
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/00, G06F11/20
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/24]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiter-Festwertspeicher mit Einrichtung zum Ersetzen defekter Speicherzellen[2000/39]
English:Semiconductor read-only memory device having means for replacing defective memory cells[2000/39]
French:Mémoire morte à semi-conducteur avec dispositif pour substituer les éléments défectueux[2000/39]
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
28.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.08.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
04.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2004Fee for grant paid
02.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.05.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0686980  (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,10-12 * column 5, line 52 - column 8, line 18; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0092646  (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-5,10-12 * page 7, line 12 - page 9, line 36 *