Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051020

EP1051020 - Telephone filter arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Williamson, Roger
Abbeydale
Much Hadham, Hertfordshire / GB
02 / Humphrey, Leslie
233 Pennymead Tower
Harlow, Essex CM20 3JF / GB
03 / Parlour, Bryan
307 Greenview Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K2B 6A8 / CA
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Hermele, Daniel Stephen , et al
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
[2006/09]
Former [2003/16]Anderson, Angela , et al
Nortel Networks IP Law Group, Harlow Laboratories, London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Former [2000/45]Ryan, John Peter William
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Application number, filing date00301197.016.02.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateUS1999030594306.05.1999         Original published format: US 305943
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1051020
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1051020
Date:03.12.2003
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/06
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/35]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filtervorrichtung für Fernsprechern[2000/45]
English:Telephone filter arrangement[2000/45]
French:Dispositif de filtrage pour postes téléphoniques[2000/45]
Examination procedure03.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/32]
09.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/50]
24.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XAY]WO9827713  (PARADYNE CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 10 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 2 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 5 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 2 * * page 13, line 6 - line 18 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,7 [Y] 6;
 [AY]US5073924  (FRISBY KENNETH G [US]) [A] 1-6,8-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 14 * * column 2, line 45 - line 54 * * column 2, line 57 - line 63 * * column 3, line 10 - line 23 * * column 3, line 52 - line 59 * * column 4, line 1 - line 5 * * column 4, line 30 - line 41 * [Y] 6;
 [A]US5506891  (BROWN PAUL M [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - line 46 * * column 2, line 50 - line 51 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 18 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 1 * * figure 1 *