Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1030343

EP1030343 - Method & system for operating a variable aperture in an ion implanter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Axcelis Technologies, Inc.
55 Cherry Hill Drive
Beverly, MA 01915-1053 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Axcelis Technologies, Inc.
55 Cherry Hill Drive
Beverly, MA 01915 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Loomis, Paul Ashby
11 Pingree Farm Road
Georgetown, Massachusetts 01833 / US
02 / Rutishauser, Hans Jurg
97 Meriman Street
Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US
03 / Lu, Jun
16 Foster Drive
Beverly, Massachusetts 01915 / US
04 / Sugitani, Michiro
2-15-57 Nakamura
Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP
05 / Murakami, Toru
2-6-5 Shounai-cho
Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP
06 / Sogabe, Hiroshi
164-1 Naranoki
Saijo-shi, Ehime / JP
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date00301219.216.02.2000
[2000/34]
Priority number, dateUS1999025337419.02.1999         Original published format: US 253374
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1030343
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1030343
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1030343
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/09, H01J37/304, H01J37/317
[2000/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/04]
Former [2000/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer variablen Apertur in einem Ionenimplantierungsgerät[2000/34]
English:Method & system for operating a variable aperture in an ion implanter[2000/34]
French:Procédé et dispositif de commande d'un diaphragme variable dans un implanteur ionique[2000/34]
Examination procedure19.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/25]
10.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2004Fee for grant paid
30.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Request for further processing for:01.09.2003Request for further processing filed
01.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.09.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1518282  (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [Y] 1,8,17 * page 3, column 2, line 70 - line 92; figure 4 *;
 [Y]EP0491313  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 16 - line 42; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US5486702  (O'CONNOR JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 8,17 * column 3, line 60 - line 67; figure 1 *