Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037136

EP1037136 - A touch-panel input type electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyazawa, Tomokazu
763-1-402 Minosho-cho
Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date00301222.616.02.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999007207217.03.1999         Original published format: JP 7207299
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037136
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037136
Date:05.11.2003
[2003/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037136
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/31]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Berührungstafeleingabevorrichtung[2000/38]
English:A touch-panel input type electronic device[2000/38]
French:Dispositif d'entrée à écran tactile[2000/38]
Examination procedure05.02.2003New documents discovered [2003/13]
12.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/07]
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.12.2004Fee for grant paid
20.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.06.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH07152475  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [DA]JPH0348318  (FUJITSU LTD) [DA] 1,3-5 * abstract *;
 [DA]JPH10207632  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1,3-5 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0519963  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0694865  (WACOM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 1, line 15 - line 23 *