EP1030348 - Chip feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd. 19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi Chiryu-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd. 19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Udagawa, Akihiro, Fuji Machine MFG. Co. Ltd. 19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsuda, Mamoru, Fuji Machine MFG. Co. Ltd. 19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301256.4 | 17.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | JP19990039866 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3986699 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1030348 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1030348 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, H05K13/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H05K13/028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/38] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Chip-Zuführer | [2000/34] | English: | Chip feeder | [2000/34] | French: | Ligne d'amenée de puces | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10178297 ; | [A]GB2244481 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0695119 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]US5828310 (FOO KEAN FONG [MY], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, lines 29-54 *; | [A]US5853079 (ITO TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 9, lines 17-32 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10178297 A 19980630 (TAIYO YUDEN CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |