Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033663

EP1033663 - Apparatus and method for generating processor usable data from natural input data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 26.05.2010  [2010/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2008/52]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Elworthy, David
14 Guest Road
Cambridge CB1 2AL / GB
[2000/46]
Former [2000/36]01 / Elworthy, David
Canon Res. Ctr. Europe Ltd., 1 Occam Road
Surrey Res. P., Guilford, Surrey GU2 5YJ / JP
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge
UB11 1JA / GB
Former [2008/25]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park
Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB
Former [2000/36]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date00301288.718.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateGB1999000466301.03.1999         Original published format: GB 9904663
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033663
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033663
Date:29.10.2003
[2003/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033663
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F17/27
[2003/43]
Former International [2000/36]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/30]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Apparat und Methode um aus natürlich-sprachlichen Eingangsdaten rechnerbenutzbare Daten zu generieren[2000/36]
English:Apparatus and method for generating processor usable data from natural input data[2000/36]
French:Méthode et appareil pour générer des données utilisables par un processeur à partir de données d'entrée en langage naturel[2008/21]
Former [2000/36]Méthode et appareil pour générer des données utilisables d'un processeur à partir de données d'entrée en langage naturel
Examination procedure26.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/22]
18.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2008Fee for grant paid
15.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49]
Request for further processing for:14.03.2005Request for further processing filed
14.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.03.2009
DE01.09.2009
[2010/21]
Former [2010/09]DE01.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]  OFLAZER K, "Dependency parsing with an extended finite state approach", BILKENT UNIVERSITY, COMPUTER ENGINEERING AND INFORMATION SCIENCE TECHNICAL REPORT, vol. BU-CEIS-9901, (19990122), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://citeseer.nj.nec.com/oflazer99dependency.html, (20030717), XP002248359 [X] 1-36 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 11 * * figures 1,3,5 *
 [DXA]  ABNEY S, "PARTIAL PARSING VIA FINITE-STATE CASCADES", EUROPEAN SCHOOL IN LOGIC, LANGUAGE AND INFORMATION. WORKSHOP ON ROBUST PARSING. ESSLLI, XX, XX, (1996), pages 8 - 15, XP000920575 [DX] 1-4,10-12,14-21,27-29,35,36 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 16 * [A] 5-9,13,22-26,30-34
 [DA]  ELWORTHY D, "Automatic error detection in part of speech tagging", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEW METHODS IN LANGUAGE PROCESSING, Manchester, (19940916), pages 130 - 135, URL: http://xxx.arxiv.cornell.edu/abs/cmp-lg/9410013, (20030717), XP002248360 [DA] 1,10,12,15,16,18,27,29,32,33,35,36 * the whole document *
 [A]  SHERIDAN P ET AL, "The application of morpho-syntactic language processing to effective phrase matching", INFORMATION PROCESSING & MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER, BARKING, GB, (1992), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0306-4573, pages 349 - 369, XP002088836 [A] 17,34-36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4573(92)90080-J