Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033222

EP1033222 - Phase change compositions and methods for selective deposition modeling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3D SYSTEMS, INC.
26081 Avenue Hall Valencia
California 91355 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
3D SYSTEMS, INC.
26081 Avenue Hall
Valencia, California 91355 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
3D SYSTEMS, INC.
26081 Avenue Hall
Valencia California 91355 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bui, Loc V.
25879 Milano Lane
Valencia, California 91355 / US
02 / Doan, Vu
7503 Mason Avenue
Winnetka, California 91306 / US
03 / Kwo, Kelly
28382 Lobelia Lane
Valencia, California 91354 / US
 [2002/27]
Former [2000/36]01 / Bui, Loc V.
25879 Milano lane
Valencia, California 91355 / US
02 / Doan, Vu
7503 Mason avenue
Winnetka, California 91306 / US
03 / Kwo, Kelly
28382 Lobelia Lane
Valencia, California 91354 / US
Representative(s)Bluff, John William , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Bluff, John William , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date00301387.722.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999025804825.02.1999         Original published format: US 258048
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033222
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033222
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C41/00, B29C67/00, C09D11/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:Phaseaustauschzusammensetzungen und selektives Materialabsatzverfahren[2000/36]
English:Phase change compositions and methods for selective deposition modeling[2000/36]
French:Compositions à changement de phase et procédé de modelage par dépôt sélectif[2000/36]
Examination procedure05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
17.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2002Fee for grant paid
23.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Request for further processing for:26.03.2002Request for further processing filed
26.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.05.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
CY22.02.2003
LU22.02.2003
IE24.02.2003
MC28.02.2003
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/44]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
CY22.02.2003
LU22.02.2003
IE24.02.2003
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/39]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
LU22.02.2003
IE24.02.2003
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/15]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
IE24.02.2003
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/04]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/02]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/51]AT11.12.2002
BE11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/39]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/37]AT11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/29]PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE11.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9826013  (MARKEM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-54 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 27; claims 1,4,9-13,29-38 *;
 [DY]US4889560  (JAEGER CHARLES W [US], et al) [DY] 1-39 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0723999  (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [Y] 40-54 * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 35; claims 1,12,13,16 *;
 [E]WO0011092  (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [E] 43 * page 9, line 3; claims 1,12 *;
 [DA]US5855836  (LEYDEN RICHARD N [US], et al) [DA] 43-50 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0856565  (OCE TECH BV [NL]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - line 55; examples 37-39,44,47 *;
 [A]EP0867487  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 40 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0844287  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,8 * column 6, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]EP0812889  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0676454  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 17 - line 22 *;
 [A]EP0654353  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 36 - page 11, line 41; figure 14 *