Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1110653

EP1110653 - Window lockout mechanism for power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Campbell, David C.
503 Barwick Court
Bel Air, Maryland 21014 / US
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Bell, Ian Stephen , et al
Black & Decker
Patent Department
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Bell, Ian Stephen , et al
Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Former [2002/33]Bell, Ian Stephen , et al
Black & Decker, Patent Department 210 Bath Road
Berks, Slough SL1 3YD / GB
Former [2001/26]Harries, Simon George , et al
Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date00301430.523.02.2000
[2001/26]
Priority number, dateUS1999025660723.12.1999         Original published format: US 256607
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1110653
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1110653
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1110653
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B23D59/00, B23Q17/24
[2001/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/26]
TitleGerman:Fensterverriegelungsmechanismus für motorisiertes Werkzeug[2001/26]
English:Window lockout mechanism for power tool[2001/26]
French:Mécanisme de verrouillage de fenêtre pour outil motorisé[2003/24]
Former [2001/26]Mécanisme de verrouillage pour de fenêtre pour outil motorisé
Examination procedure02.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/49]
01.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2005Fee for grant paid
20.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
CY06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
IE23.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2007/12]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
IE23.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2007/08]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/44]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/26]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/22]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0810071  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,7-11 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US3889992  (SHELTON BILLY GEORGE) [Y] 1,4,7-10 * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 45; figures 1,3 *;
 [Y]US1922676  (CURTIS GREENE) [Y] 2,11 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 67; figure 4 *
ExaminationUS5226201