Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041248

EP1041248 - Self retaining blade damper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stec, Philip Francis
23 Winford Way
Medford, Massachusetts 02155 / US
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date00301473.524.02.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateUS1999028342901.04.1999         Original published format: US 283429
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1041248
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1041248
Date:03.07.2002
[2002/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041248
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/22, F01D11/00
[2002/27]
Former International [2000/40]F01D5/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/13]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Selbstsichernder Schwingungsdämpfer für Turbinenschaufeln[2000/40]
English:Self retaining blade damper[2000/40]
French:Elément amortisseur autobloquant pour aubes de turbine[2000/40]
Examination procedure03.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/10]
26.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2006Fee for grant paid
09.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/04]
Former [2007/35]IT04.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0851097  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,11-18 * column 3, line 18 - line 26 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 3 * * column 7, line 29 - line 40 * * figure - * [Y] 9,10,19,20;
 [X]GB879444  (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-4,6,11,12 * page 2, line 78 - line 105 * * page 3, line 57 - line 115 * * figures 2-4,6 *;
 [X]GB2194000  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 2, line 50 - line 72 * * page 3, line 39 - line 90 * * page 4, line 63 - line 115 * * figures 2,4-6 *;
 [YA]US5281097  (WILSON PAUL S [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,19,20 * column 3, line 44 - line 64 * * abstract * [A] 1-4,11-14
ExaminationEP0816638