Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033777

EP1033777 - Fabricating high-Q RF components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Frye, Robert Charles
334B Carlton Avenue
Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US
02 / Low, Yee Leng
11 Berkeley Square
Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US
03 / Tai, King Lien
95 Highland Circle
Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/47]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [2000/36]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date00301530.228.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999026109302.03.1999         Original published format: US 261093
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033777
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033777
Date:25.07.2001
[2001/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033777
Date:16.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01P11/00, H05K3/24
[2004/37]
Former International [2000/36]H01P11/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/16]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren von RF Bauteilen mit hohem Q-Faktor[2000/36]
English:Fabricating high-Q RF components[2000/36]
French:Procédé de fabrication de composants RF à facteur Q élevé[2000/36]
Examination procedure29.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
17.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2004Fee for grant paid
16.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4303480  (WOOD JOHN H, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 53 * [A] 8;
 [A]US5834995  (RICHARDS RANDY J [US], et al) [A] 8 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 27; figures 4A-4C,14A *;
 [A]US4703392  (ROBERTSON BRIAN T [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 38-63; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4808274  (NGUYEN PASCALINE H [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 39 *;
 [A]  J -P RAMY ET AL, "OPTIMIZATION OF THE THICK- AND THIN-FILM TECHNOLOGIES FOR MICROWAVE CIRCUITS ON ALUMINA AND FUSED SILICA SUBSTRATES", TRANSACTIONS OF THE IRE PROFESSIONAL GROUP ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES,IEEE INC. NEW YORK,US, (197810), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 814 - 820, XP002150223 [A] 1,8 * page 816, column R, lines 21-27 *