Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035628

EP1035628 - Improvements relating to emergency lighting units and installations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.03.2003  [2003/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emergi-lite safety Systems Ltd
bruntcliffe Lane Morley
Leeds LS27 9LL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Emergi-lite safety Systems Ltd
bruntcliffe Lane
Morley, Leeds LS27 9LL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Young, Neil Martin
45 St Leonards Oval
Harrogate, North Yorkshire HG2 8NT / GB
02 / Bowker, Steven Mark
17 Stones Lane
Golcar, Huddersfield HD7 4ET / GB
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Denmark, James Christopher
Bailey Walsh & Co.
5 York Place
Leeds
LS1 2SD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Denmark, James Christopher
Bailey Walsh & Co., 5 York Place
Leeds, LS1 2SD / GB
Application number, filing date00301536.928.02.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateGB1999000451827.02.1999         Original published format: GB 9904518
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035628
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02J9/06, H05B37/03, G08B29/12
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Verbesserungen die Notbeleuchtungen und die Installationen betreffen[2000/37]
English:Improvements relating to emergency lighting units and installations[2000/37]
French:Améliorations des unités d'éclairage de secours et des installations[2000/37]
Examination procedure17.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
29.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/10]
07.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/10]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0537651  (CEAG SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,10 [A] 12;
 [XA]EP0191579  (DUAL LITE MFG [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9 [A] 10,12;
 [XA]US4945280  (BEGHELLI GIAN P [IT]) [X] 1-5 [A] 7,8;
 [X]WO9204758  (MINITRONICS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-5,7-12;
 [DA]GB1567506  (SUNBEAM LAMPS & LIGHTING LTD) [DA] 1-12;
 [DA]GB2059196  (RING LAMP CO LTD) [DA] 1-5,7-12