blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1039187
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000314378Global Dossier 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9906439 19.03.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1039187Global Dossier 20.04.2005B1
EP1039187 02.01.2002A3
EP1039187 27.09.2000A2
Priority number Date
GB9906439 19.03.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT293767T 15.05.2005T
Priority number Date
GB9906439 19.03.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE60019486T 23.02.2006T2
DE60019486D 25.05.2005D1
Priority number Date
GB9906439 19.03.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2237386T 01.08.2005T3
Priority number Date
GB9906439 19.03.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9906439D 12.05.1999D0
Priority number Date
GB9906439 19.03.1999