Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039187

EP1039187 - Flame arresters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/39]Improvements in flame arresters
[2004/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Kusay, Roland Gregor Paul
14 Blackstone Hill, Redhill
Surrey, RH1 6BE / GB
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Bousfield, Roger James , et al
The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road
Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Bousfield, Roger James , et al
The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Application number, filing date00301546.828.02.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateGB1999000643919.03.1999         Original published format: GB 9906439
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039187
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039187
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039187
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16K3/312, F16K3/02
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Flammschutzeinrichtung[2000/39]
English:Flame arresters[2004/44]
French:Dispositif pare-flamme[2000/39]
Former [2000/39]Improvements in flame arresters
Examination procedure31.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/31]
01.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2005Fee for grant paid
31.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
CY20.04.2005
FI20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
PT20.09.2005
[2009/02]
Former [2006/14]AT20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
FI20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
PT20.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT20.04.2005
FI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI20.04.2005
SE20.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE20.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2402496  (RICKENBACH HUGO) [A] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * figure . *;
 [A]DE3538883  (GRONOWSKI ARTUR) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]DE3218573  (BRANDSCHUTZ UND SERVICE VERTRI [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - *