blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1033100 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1033100



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 383
22.02.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.04.2007 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
10.04.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.03.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 50
22.03.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.03.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
09.03.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
07.03.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.03.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
07.03.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
07.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
03.11.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.11.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.11.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
24.03.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
03.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
03.03.2005 Description Search / examination 8
03.03.2005 Description Search / examination 17
03.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.12.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.09.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
03.09.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
13.04.2004 Description Search / examination 7
13.04.2004 Description Search / examination 17
13.04.2004 Drawings Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 26
01.12.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
01.12.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2003 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.02.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.02.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
11.09.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.07.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.07.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.07.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
18.07.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
09.07.2001 Urgent letter Search / examination 1
16.10.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.06.2000 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
30.05.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.05.2000 Drawings Search / examination 12
10.05.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 58
02.05.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
15.04.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.04.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 12
01.03.2000 Description Search / examination 27
01.03.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Drawings Search / examination 11
01.03.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7