blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1033100


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2009  [2009/33]
04.04.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.05.2008  [2008/19]
22.02.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.03.2008  [2008/13]
25.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2008  [2008/09]
18.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2008  [2008/08]
21.12.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.01.2008  [2008/04]
09.11.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2007  [2007/50]
26.10.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.11.2007  [2007/48]
04.05.2007 Correction of patent specification published on  06.06.2007  [2007/23]
06.04.2007 Change - applicant published on  09.05.2007  [2007/19]
16.03.2007 (Expected) grant published on  18.04.2007  [2007/16]
15.03.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
15.03.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.02.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.10.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.10.2006 Change - French title published on  22.11.2006  [2006/47]
13.10.2006 Change - French title published on  15.11.2006  [2006/46]
23.02.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.12.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.09.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.04.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.02.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2003 First examination report
27.11.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.03.2003 Renewal fee
06.08.2002 Change - extension states
05.04.2002 Renewal fee
05.04.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  22.05.2002  [2002/21]
22.03.2002 Request for examination filed published on  08.05.2002  [2002/19]
20.07.2001 Publication of search report published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
10.11.2000 Change - inventor published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
21.07.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]