Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033100

EP1033100 - Dispenser for dispensing toilet tissue from rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2008
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 12.08.2009  [2009/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP
133 Peachtree Street, N.E.
Atlanta GA 30303 / US
[2007/19]
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
Fort James Corporation
1650 Lake Cook Road Deerfield
IL 60015-0089 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Fort James Corporation
1650 Lake Cook Road
Deerfield, IL 60015-0089 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Grasso, Kamala J.
44 Rice Road
Wayland, Massachusetts 01778 / US
02 / Short, Jason E.
4 Glen Terrace
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
03 / Mervar, Robert
4431 Northeast Stanton Street
Portland, Oregon 97213 / US
04 / Moody, John R.
1229 Westbreeze Drive
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
05 / Johnson, Douglas W.
1725 Rebecca Lane
Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US
06 / Johnson, Peter D.
550 Casey Court
Aurora, Illinois 60504 / US
[2000/52]
Former [2000/36]01 / Grasso, Kamala J.
44 Rice Road
Wayland, Massachusetts 01778 / US
02 / Short, Jason E.
4 Glen Terrace
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
03 / Mervar, Robert
3073 NW Ashford Circle
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US
04 / Moody, John R.
1229 Westbreeze Drive
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
05 / Johnson, Douglas W.
1725 Rebecca Lane
Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US
06 / Johnson, Peter D.
550 Casey Court
Aurora, Illinois 60504 / US
Representative(s)Barnfather, Karl Jon , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr. , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00301653.201.03.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999026235504.03.1999         Original published format: US 262355
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033100
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033100
Date:05.09.2001
[2001/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033100
Date:18.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/16]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1033100
Date:06.06.2007
[2007/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47K10/38
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:Spender zum Spenden von Toilettenpapier von Rollen[2000/36]
English:Dispenser for dispensing toilet tissue from rolls[2000/36]
French:Distributeur pour distribuer du papier toilette à partir de rouleaux[2006/47]
Former [2000/36]Distributeur pour distribuer du papier toilette à partir de rouleaux
Examination procedure01.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
01.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2007Fee for grant paid
07.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
15.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.04.2007
BE18.04.2007
CH18.04.2007
CY18.04.2007
DK18.04.2007
FI18.04.2007
LI18.04.2007
NL18.04.2007
SE18.07.2007
GR19.07.2007
PT18.09.2007
[2009/33]
Former [2008/19]AT18.04.2007
BE18.04.2007
CH18.04.2007
DK18.04.2007
FI18.04.2007
LI18.04.2007
NL18.04.2007
SE18.07.2007
GR19.07.2007
PT18.09.2007
Former [2008/09]AT18.04.2007
BE18.04.2007
CH18.04.2007
DK18.04.2007
FI18.04.2007
LI18.04.2007
NL18.04.2007
SE18.07.2007
PT18.09.2007
Former [2008/08]AT18.04.2007
BE18.04.2007
CH18.04.2007
DK18.04.2007
FI18.04.2007
LI18.04.2007
SE18.07.2007
PT18.09.2007
Former [2008/04]AT18.04.2007
BE18.04.2007
CH18.04.2007
FI18.04.2007
LI18.04.2007
SE18.07.2007
PT18.09.2007
Former [2007/50]AT18.04.2007
CH18.04.2007
FI18.04.2007
LI18.04.2007
SE18.07.2007
PT18.09.2007
Former [2007/48]CH18.04.2007
FI18.04.2007
LI18.04.2007
SE18.07.2007
PT18.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0835630  (FORT JAMES CORP [US]) [A] 1,11,15,19 * column 3, line 33 - column 7, line 6; figure - *;
 [A]US3656699  (SCHNYDER CONRAD W, et al) [A] 1,11,15,19 * column 2, line 52 - column 5, line 58; figure - *
by applicantUS3010670
 US5265816
 US3656699
 US3211504
 US3294329
 US4998681
 US4375874
 US3637276
 US3381909
 US2487763