EP1037307 - Planar radiation oscillator apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Information and Communications Technology, Independent Administrative Institution 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-Shi Tokyo 184-0015 / JP | For all designated states Matsui, Toshiaki 2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi 4-chome Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-Shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsui, Toshiaki 2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi 4-chome Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | |||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-Shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsui, Toshiaki 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Communications Research Laboratory, Independent Administrative Institution 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-Shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsui, Toshiaki 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH LABORATORY, MINISTRY OF POSTS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS 2-1, Nukui-Kitamachi 4-chome Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184 / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsui, Toshiaki 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsui, Toshiaki, c/o Communications Res. Lab. Ministry Post Telecomm., 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Murata, Masami, c/o Communications Res. Lab. Ministry Post Telecomm., 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301771.2 | 03.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | JP19990059070 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5907099 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1037307 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1037307 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1037307 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q23/00, H01Q9/04 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0407 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/42] |
Former [2003/39] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ebene abstrahlende Oszillatoranordnung | [2000/38] | English: | Planar radiation oscillator apparatus | [2000/38] | French: | Appareil oscillateur plan rayonnant | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 03.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   13.08.2003 | 08.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   13.08.2003 | 08.08.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   13.08.2003 | 08.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1131918 ; | [X] - MURATA M ET AL, Active radiating butterfly antenna, ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, 1997. IEEE., 1997 DIGEST MONTREAL, QUE., CANADA 13-18 JULY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 2464-2467, ISBN 0-7803-4178-3, XP010246706 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APS.1997.625499 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11031918 A 19990202 (YUSEISHO TSUSHIN SOGO KENKYUSHO) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [PX] - MURATA M ET AL, "2*2 spatial power combining array of planar radiating oscillator using butterfly-shaped patch element", 29TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE 99. INCORPORATING MIOP '99. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS OF 29TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, MUNICH, GERMANY, 5-7 OCT. 1999, 1999, London, UK, Microwave Eng. Eur, UK, ISBN 0-86213-152-9, pages 201 - 204 vol.2, XP001107285 [PX] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - WU X D ET AL, NOVEL FET ACTIVE PATCH ANTENNA, ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, VOL. 28, NR. 20, PAGE(S) 1853-1854, ISSN 0013-5194, XP000376596 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - SUN L Q ET AL, SPATIAL POWER-COMBINING USING CPW-FED BOWTIE ANTENNAS, IEEE MICROWAVE AND GUIDED WAVE LETTERS, IEEE INC, NEW YORK, US, VOL. 8, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 60-62, ISSN 1051-8207, XP000730350 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/75.658641 | [DA] - WU X-D ET AL, NOVEL ACTIVE FET CIRCULAR PATCH ANTENNA ARRAYS FOR QUASI-OPTICAL POWER COMBINING, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 42, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 766-771, ISSN 0018-9480, XP000451074 [DA] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.293523 | [DA] - YORK R A ET AL, QUASI-OPTICAL POWER COMBINING USING MUTUALLY SYNCHRONIZED OSCILLATOR ARRAYS, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 39, NR. 6, PAGE(S) 1000-1009, ISSN 0018-9480, XP000202830 [DA] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.81670 |