Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034699

EP1034699 - Single bearing fishing reel and sounding mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
Shimano Inc.
77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Morise, Taisei
Aminity I 305, 2090-4, Fukaishimizu-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/29]Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, Chartered Patent Agents, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Former [2000/37]Cooper, John , et al
SCEPTRE, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date00301982.510.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1999006603012.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6603099
JP1999008335126.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8335199
JP1999012050927.04.1999         Original published format: JP 12050999
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1034699
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1034699
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034699
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01K89/016, A01K89/01
[2000/49]
Former International [2000/37]A01K89/016
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Angelrolle mit einem Lager und einem Schallmechanismus[2000/37]
English:Single bearing fishing reel and sounding mechanism[2000/37]
French:Moulinet de pêche doté d'un seul roulement et pourvu d'un mécanisme sonore[2000/37]
Examination procedure07.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
08.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2003Fee for grant paid
09.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
PT17.08.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2005/18]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
Former [2005/02]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI17.03.2004
SE17.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29801217U  (STENZEL GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1637334  (PLINY CATUCCI) [A] 1 * page 1, line 62 - line 74; figure 1 *;
 [A]US1612177  (PLINY CATUCCI) [A] 1,2,4,10 * page 1, line 66 - line 82; figure 5 *;
 [A]US1612178  (PLINY CATUCCI) [A] 1,2,4,10 * page 2, line 11 - line 26 * * page 2, line 69 - line 91; figure 4 *;
 [A]US3574339  (SARAH THOMAS F) [A] 11,12 * column 3, line 34 - line 42; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2059765  (ADAMS WALTER L) [A] 14,15,19 * page 1, column R, line 15 - line 30; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5556050  (BAISCH ERIC K [US], et al) [A] 14,15,19 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 36; figures 14-20 *;
 [A]US2116581  (NORTON MOOR EDWARD)