Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051054

EP1051054 - Method for subscribing to a communication service [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/45]Method for registering with a communication service
[2015/23]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2016
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.03.2016  [2016/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Mobility II LLC
5565 Glenridge Connector Suite 1700
Atlanta, GA 30342 / US
[2010/21]
Former [2010/14]For all designated states
AT & T Mobility II, LLC
5565 Glenridge Connector, Suite 1700
Atlanta, GA 30342 / US
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
AT&T WIRELESS SERVICES, INC.
14520 N.E. 87th Street
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Denenberg, Jack
1800 Wingfield Drive
Longwood, Florida 32779 / US
02 / Febo, Denise
14710 51st Avenue, SE
Everett, Washington 9828 / US
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date00302020.313.03.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateUS1999030676107.05.1999         Original published format: US 306761
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1051054
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1051054
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04W4/24
[2015/23]
Former International [2000/45]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2001/40]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Subskripieren von Kommunikationsdienst[2015/23]
English:Method for subscribing to a communication service[2015/23]
French:Procédé pour l'abonnement à un service de communication[2015/23]
Former [2000/45]Verfahren zum Anmelden bei einem Kommunikationsdienst
Former [2000/45]Method for registering with a communication service
Former [2000/45]Procédé pour enregistrer avec un service de communication
Examination procedure28.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
12.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/09]
23.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2003
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
07.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
07.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201516   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9734438  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 18, line 24 - page 20, line 14 * [Y] 8;
 [Y]US5862480  (WILD JOHANNA ALEXANDRA [US], et al) [Y] 8 * column W *;
 [A]WO9624226  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column W *;
 [A]EP0685972  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 21 - column 9, line 47 *