Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036747

EP1036747 - Gripper block for feeding coiled tubing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 1431
Duncan
Oklahoma 73536 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 1431
Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Parks, Kenneth C.
Route 4, Box 233-G1
Duncan, Oklahoma 73533 / US
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date00302136.716.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateUS1999027063517.03.1999         Original published format: US 270635
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1036747
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1036747
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036747
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65G37/00, E21B19/22, B66D3/00, B65H51/14
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/39]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Greiferblock zum Vorschub eines aufgewickelten Rohrstranges[2000/38]
English:Gripper block for feeding coiled tubing[2000/38]
French:Mâchoire pour propulsion de tubage enroulé[2000/38]
Examination procedure05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
31.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2003Fee for grant paid
19.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4336901  (GRAY BENJAMIN C) [X] 1-4,9,10 * column 1, line 52 - line 64; figure 3 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 5 * [Y] 5;
 [DY]EP0486324  (OTIS ENG CO [US]) [DY] 5 * page 7, line 8 - line 21; figure 14 *;
 [A]US3182877  (SLATOR DAMON T, et al) [A] 1,10 * column 6, line 56 - line 69; figure 9 *
by applicantUS5094340
 US5853118