Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037011

EP1037011 - Thickneee measurement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
API Foils Limited
Firth Road, Houstoun Industrial Estate Livingston, West Lothian
Scotland RH54 5DJ / GB
For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF EDINBURGH OF OLD COLLEGE
South Bridge Edinburgh EH8 9YL
Scotland / GB
For all designated states
HERIOT-WATT UNIVERSITY
Riccarton
Edinburgh EH14 4AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
API Foils Limited
Firth Road, Houstoun Industrial Estate
Livingston, West Lothian, Scotland RH54 5DJ / GB
For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF EDINBURGH OF OLD COLLEGE
South Bridge
Edinburgh EH8 9YL Scotland / GB
For all designated states
HERIOT-WATT UNIVERSITY
Riccarton
Edinburgh EH14 4AS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Anita
3 Peggie's Knowe, Dolphinton
West Linton, Peeblesshire EH46 7AL / GB
02 / Barton, James Stephen
33 Temple Village
Gorebridge, Midlothian EH23 4SQ / GB
03 / De Freitas, Jolyon Mark
21 North Street
Ratho, Newbridge EH28 8RP / GB
04 / Jones, Julian David Clayton
3 Peggie's Knowe, Dolphinton
West Linton, Peeblesshire EH46 7AL / GB
05 / Spencer, Philip Norman
3 Hallcroft Park
Ratho, Newbridge EH28 8RZ / GB
06 / Gregory, Guy John
33 Albyn Drive
Livingston, EH54 9JA / GB
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Slingsby, Philip Roy , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Slingsby, Philip Roy , et al
Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date00302172.216.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateGB1999000601216.03.1999         Original published format: GB 9906012
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037011
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037011
Date:23.05.2001
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/06
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Dickenabmessung[2000/38]
English:Thickneee measurement apparatus[2000/38]
French:Dispositif pour la mesure de l'épaisseur[2000/38]
Examination procedure11.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/11]
03.10.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.11.2001M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5162131  (RANTANEN RAUNO [FI], et al) [Y] 1-12,16-19 * column W *;
 [YD]US4956558  (BATISHKO CHARLES R [US], et al) [YD] 1-12,16-19 * column W *