Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043840

EP1043840 - Methods for simultaneous analog-to-digital conversion and multiplication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pixim Incorporated
883 North Shoreline Blvd.
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
PIXIM INCORPORATED
883 North Shoreline Blvd.
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Pixim Incorporated
883 North Shoreline Blvd.
Mountain View, CA 94042 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Yang, David Xiao Dong
2020 California Avenue
Mt. View, CA 94306 / US
02 / Fowler, Boyd A.
265 S.Bayview Avenue, No.F
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
03 / Gamal, Abbas el
1485 Hamilton Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Perkins, Sarah , et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]Perkins, Sarah , et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn
London EC1N 2JD / GB
Former [2000/41]Perkins, Sarah
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn
London EC1N 2JD / GB
Application number, filing date00302217.517.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateUS1999027420222.03.1999         Original published format: US 274202
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043840
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043840
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03M1/12
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:Methoden zur simultanen Analog-Digital-Wandlung und Multiplikation[2000/41]
English:Methods for simultaneous analog-to-digital conversion and multiplication[2000/41]
French:Methode pour la conversion simultanée analoque-numérique avec multiplication[2000/41]
Examination procedure29.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
02.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
17.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US4763007  (TAKAHASHI JUNICHI [JP]) [A] 1-19;
 [A]US5461425  (FOWLER BOYD [US], et al) [A] 1-19;
 [A]US5684419  (MURDEN FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1-19;
 [DA]US5801657  (FOWLER BOYD [US], et al)