Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046666

EP1046666 - Core-crush resistant fabric and prepreg for fiber reinforced composite sandwich structures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEXCEL CORPORATION
11711 Dublin Boulevard Dublin
California 94568 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/05]For all designated states
Hexcel Corporation
11711 Dublin Boulevard
Dublin, California 94568 / US
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
Hexcel Corporation
5794 West Las Positas Boulevard
Pleasanton, California 94588 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hsiao, Hao-ming
2525 Promontory Circle
San Ramon, California 94583 / US
02 / Buyny, Robert Albert
3111 Morgan Territory Road
Clayton, California 94517 / US
03 / Lee, Shaw Ming
862 Columbine Court
Danville, California 94526 / US
04 / Martin, Carey Joseph
2365 Foothill Road #2
Pleasanton, California 94588 / US
 [2004/14]
Former [2000/43]01 / Hsiao, Hao-ming
2525 Promontory Circle
San Ramon, California 94583 / US
02 / Bunny, Robert Albert
3111 Morgan Territory Road
Clayton, California 94517 / US
03 / Lee, Shaw Ming
862 Columbine Court
Danville, California 94526 / US
04 / Martin, Carey Joseph
2365 Foothill Road #2
Pleasanton, California 94588 / US
Representative(s)MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date00302242.320.03.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateUS1999027363723.03.1999         Original published format: US 273637
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1046666
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046666
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08J5/24, D03D15/00, B32B5/12
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:Gewebe und Verbundwirkstoff mit verbessertem Widerstand gegen das Zusammendrücken des Kerns für faserverstärkte Verbundwirkstoffe[2000/43]
English:Core-crush resistant fabric and prepreg for fiber reinforced composite sandwich structures[2000/43]
French:Tissus avec une resistance amelioree a l'ecrasement de l'ame et preimpregne pour corp alveolaires renforces[2000/43]
Examination procedure03.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
07.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
13.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2004Fee for grant paid
15.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01130563.8  / EP1205507
EP01130572.9  / EP1205508
EP01130573.7  / EP1205509
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
PT18.01.2005
CY20.03.2005
LU20.03.2005
IE21.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/26]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
CY20.03.2005
LU20.03.2005
IE21.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/20]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
CY20.03.2005
IE21.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/08]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
IE21.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/23]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
IE21.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/13]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/28]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/22]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/21]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/18]AT18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/13]AT18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE18.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0439197  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-30 * page 3, lines 51-53 *;
 [L]EP1001063  (BOEING CO [US]) [L] 1-30 * page 2, lines 39-41 *;
 [L]WO9961233  (CYTEC TECH CORP [US], et al) [L] 1-30 * Abstract *