Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043824

EP1043824 - Battery charge control circuit, battery charging device, and battery charge control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 26.02.2014  [2014/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2012/52]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saeki, Mitsuo
c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Ozawa, Hidekiyo
c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Kitagawa, Seiya
151, 11 Bancho
Gunchiku
Yatsushiro-shi, Kumamoto 866-0002 / JP
04 / Matsuyama, Toshiyuki
c/o Fujitsu VLSI Limited
1844-2, Kozoki-cho 2-chome
Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP
 [2012/33]
Former [2000/41]01 / Saeki, Mitsuo, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Ozawa, Hidekiyo, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Kitagawa, Seiya
151, 11 Bancho, Gunchiku
Yatsushiro-shi, Kumamoto 866-0002 / JP
04 / Matsuyama, Toshiyuki, Fujitsi VLSI Limited
1844-2, Kozoki-cho 2-chome
Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0013 / JP
Representative(s)Keltsch, Ulrike , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/21]Holz, Ulrike , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2012/52]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2000/41]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date00302380.123.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateJP1999010315909.04.1999         Original published format: JP 10315999
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043824
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043824
Date:28.05.2003
[2003/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043824
Date:26.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/02, H02J7/00
[2012/18]
Former International [2000/41]H02J7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/08]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Batterieladesteuerungsschaltung, Batterieladeeinrichtung und Batterieladesteuerungsverfahren[2000/41]
English:Battery charge control circuit, battery charging device, and battery charge control method[2000/41]
French:Circuit de commande de charge d'une batterie, dispositif de charge d'une batterie, et méthode de commande de charge d'une batterie[2000/41]
Examination procedure08.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
04.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2012Fee for grant paid
12.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.07.2006
Opposition(s)27.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB26.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
[2014/09]
Former [2014/07]FR02.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5504413  (FERNANDEZ JOSE M [US], et al) [X] 1,5,32,66 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 32 * [A] 60,20,26,36,48,54,69,70;
 [A]DE19621439  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,20,26,36,48,54,60,66,69,70 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5532935  (NINOMIYA RYOJI [JP], et al) [A] * column 7, line 53 - column 9, line 13 *;
 [A]GB2121971  (LUCAS IND PLC);
 [X]US5847543  (CARROLL BARRY N [US]) [X] 62 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 30 * * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 32 *;
 [A]US5777399  (SHIBUYA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 15,18,46,62,67 * column 5, line 60 - column 8, line 23 *;
 [A]US5689172  (KOYAMA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 64,68 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5778325  (LINDELL BO KARL [SE], et al) [A] 64,68 * column 7, line 16 - line 40 *;
 [A]US5625275  (TANIKAWA ROY [US], et al);
 [A]US5576611  (YOSHIDA TAKESHI [JP])
by applicantUS5504413