EP1038499 - Interior alignment light for open magnet MRI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murphy, Lawrence Elwood 3839 North Murray Avenue Shorewood, Wisconsin 53211 / US | 02 /
Keen, Robert Glenn 4825 South Forest Avenue New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302392.6 | 23.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | US19990274374 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: US 274374 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1038499 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038499 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, G01R33/28 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
G01R33/28 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/704 (US);
G01R33/3806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Inneres Ausrichtungslicht für ein MRI-System mit offenem Magnet | [2000/39] | English: | Interior alignment light for open magnet MRI | [2000/39] | French: | Faisceau d'alignement interne pour un système RMI à aimant ouvert | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4538289 (SCHEIBENGRABER KARL J [US]) [A] 1-17,19,20* column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 17 *; | [A]EP0373000 (PICKER INT LTD [GB]) [A] 3 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 5; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]EP0577001 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,3,9-15,17,19,20 * column 6, lines 6-39; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]DE4440225 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-8,16 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, lines 10-16; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,9-15,17,19,20 |