Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039448

EP1039448 - Phase change recording with crystallization improving layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kojima, Rie
Room 402, Gureisuhaimu-Ida, 35-7, Suehirocho
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0030 / JP
02 / Kitaura, Hideki
33-2-2-2 Hikaridai 4-chome, Seikacho
Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
03 / Yamada, Noboru
1-4-2, Kuzuhaoka
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1104 / JP
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Jeffrey, Philip Michael
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Jeffrey, Philip Michael
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date00302413.024.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateJP1999008331226.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8331299
JP1999032653717.11.1999         Original published format: JP 32653799
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039448
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039448
Date:14.11.2001
[2001/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039448
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/24, G11B7/26, B41M5/26
[2001/34]
Former International [2000/39]G11B7/00, G11B7/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/31]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Phasenwechselaufzeichnung mit Schicht zur Verbesserung der Kristallisation[2000/39]
English:Phase change recording with crystallization improving layer[2000/39]
French:Enregistrement à changement de phase avec couche pour amélioration de crystallisation[2000/39]
Examination procedure12.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
16.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2005Fee for grant paid
07.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03026442.8  / EP1396853
EP05001400.0  / EP1526522
EP05001401.8  / EP1526523
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XPDAY]EP0980068  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [XPD] 1-8,10,12,21,22 * reflecting WO 98/47142 published on 22.10.1998 in Gazette 1998/42.; page 3, line 6 - line 7 * * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 20 * * paragraph [0039] * * page 6, line 5 - line 10 * * page 6, line 23 - line 29; figure 1 * * page 7, line 39 - line 41 * * page 10, line 41 - line 43 * * page 17, line 36 - line 47 * * page 17; table 1 * [A] 27-29,3,9,15,16 [Y] 26,27,30,33-35,37,11,13-15,40,19,38,31;
 [XYA]WO9847142  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12,21,22 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 11,13-15,26,27,30,33-35,37,40 [A] 3,9,15,16,27-29;
 [Y]US5652036  (KOBAYASHI TADASHI [JP]) [Y] 11 * column 7, line 28 - line 35; figure 1 * * column 17, line 8 - line 30; table 2 *;
 [Y]US5631895  (OKADA MITSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 11,31 * column 5, line 7 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5446723  (BEST MARGARET E [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * column 3, line 53 - column 6, line 10; figure 2B *;
 [Y]US5764619  (NISHIUCHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * column 14, line 36 - line 61 *;
 [YA]US5135819  (ITO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 15,40 * column 5, line 5 - line 12 * [A] 16;
 [XY]EP0499273  (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 17,18,20,22,24,25,30,39,41,42 * page 5, line 54 - line 56 * [Y] 19,26,27,30-38;
 [X]JPH0294039  ;
 [Y]JPH023119  ;
 [Y]JPS62209741  ;
 [Y]JPH08315360  ;
 [Y]EP0683485  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 36 * column 4, line 27 - line 49; figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US5581539  (HORIE MICHIKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 32 * column 15, line 34 - line 40 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900628), vol. 014, no. 301, Database accession no. (P - 1069), [X] 23 * abstract *
 [A]  - Wörterbuch der Chemie, MÜNCHEN, DEUTSCHER TASCHENBUCH VERLAG, (199506), XP002176892 [A] 30 * page 37 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900315), vol. 014, no. 138, Database accession no. (P - 1022), [Y] 31 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880305), vol. 012, no. 071, Database accession no. (P - 673), [Y] 31 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, [Y] 31 * abstract *