Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1137236

EP1137236 - Processing network address identifiers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.12.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2002  [2002/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Representative(s)Evershed, Michael , et al
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]Evershed, Michael , et al
BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Application number, filing date00302425.424.03.2000
[2001/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1137236
Date:26.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/58
[2001/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verarbeitung von Netzadressenidentifikatoren[2001/39]
English:Processing network address identifiers[2001/39]
French:Traitment d'identificateurs d'adresse réseau[2001/39]
Examination procedure25.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/07]
06.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5)  [2002/07]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0462725  (IBM) [A] 1-11 * page 6, line 58 - page 7, line 56; claims 1,2 *;
 [XA]  - TANG D ET AL, "A GATEWAY BETWEEN MHS (X.400) AND SMTP", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTER STANDARDS CONFERENCE. (COMPSTAN),US,WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19880321), vol. CONF. 2, ISBN 0-8186-0791-2, pages 7 - 14, XP000345678 [X] 1-5,10,11 * page 10, column R, paragraph 5.1 - page 12, column L, line 4 * * page 12, column R, paragraph 6 - page 13, column L, line 37 * [A] 6-9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSTAND.1988.4753
 [A]  - SCHULZRINNE H ET AL, "INTERNET TELEPHONY: ARCHITECTURE AND PROTOCOLS - AN IETF PERSPECTIVE", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, (19990211), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 237 - 255, XP000700321 [A] 1-11 * page 246, paragraph 5.1 - page 249, column R, line 6 * * page 251, column R, line 17 - page 253, column L, line 27 *