Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056246

EP1056246 - Internet protocol (IP) class-of-service routing technique [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[2000/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Ash, Gerald Richard
4 Beechwood Avenue,West Long Branch
Monmouth County, New Jersey 07764 / US
02 / Chen, Jiayu
10 Ramsgate Drive,Morganville
Monmouth County, New Jersey 07751 / US
03 / Fishman, Saul Daniel
616 Cinder Road, Edison
Middlesex County, New Jersey 08820 / US
04 / Maunder, Anurag S.
20 Country Club Lane,Scotch Plains
Union County, New Jersey 07076 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date00302451.024.03.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateUS1999032102727.05.1999         Original published format: US 321027
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1056246
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1056246
Date:29.01.2003
[2003/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1056246
Date:26.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/42]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein auf Diensteklassen basiertes Internet-Protokoll(IP) Wegelenkungsverfahren[2006/13]
English:Internet protocol (IP) class-of-service routing technique[2000/48]
French:Procédé d'acheminement basé sur classe de service pour protocol Internet[2006/13]
Former [2000/48]Auf Dienstklasse basiertes Internet-Protokoll(IP) Weglenkungsverfahren
Former [2000/48]Procédé d'achéminement pour le protocol Internet basse sur la classe de service
Examination procedure11.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
02.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
24.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2006Fee for grant paid
11.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XAY]  CRAWLEY ET AL., "RFC 2386: A Framework for QoS-based Routing in the Internet", IETF, Internet, (199808), pages 1 - 37, URL: ftp://ftp.isi.edu/in-notes/rfc2386.txt, (20021031), XP002219363 [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,18 * page 3, line 21 - line 33 * * page 4, line 9 - line 14 * * page 4, line 17 - line 21 * * page 5, line 2 - line 9 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 13 - line 17 * * page 9, line 34 - page 10, line 3 * * page 10, line 35 - line 41 * * page 13, line 24 - line 28 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 3,7
 [Y]  DEEPAK SREEKANTAN, DHANANJAYA RAO, "Implementation of a Bandwidth Broker System for Resource Management in Differentiated Services", UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS, Lawrence, KS 66045-2228, (19990516), page 1, URL: http://www.ittc.ukans.edu/~kdrao/845/intro.html,, (20021031), XP002219364 [Y] 3,7 * page 3, line 8 - line 16 *
 [A]  JAMIN S ET AL, "A MEASUREMENT-BASED ADMISSION CONTROL ALGORITHM FOR INTEGRATED SERVICE PACKET NETWORKS", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970201), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 56 - 69, XP000678916 [A] 8,9,12-17 * page 56, column L, line 46 - column R, line 12 * * page 56, column R, line 53 - line 56 * * page 59, column L, line 27 - line 30 * * page 59, column R, line 23 - line 37 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.554722