Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049066

EP1049066 - Provision of educational material over a communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Junglebyte PTE Ltd.
21 Science Park Road, No. 03-09 The Aquarius Singapore Science Park II
Singapoe 117628 / SG
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Junglebyte PTE Ltd.
21 Science Park Road, No. 03-09 The Aquarius
Singapore Science Park II, Singapoe 117628 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / Alp, Burak
18 Tong Watt Road, No. 04-02
Singapore 238010 / SG
02 / Bouquet, Christophe
208 Upper East Coast Road, No. 06-02
Singapore 455287 / SG
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridge
PE27 5PD / GB
Former [2000/44]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street
St. Ives, Cambridge PE17 4EB / GB
Application number, filing date00302455.124.03.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateSG1999000211330.04.1999         Original published format: SG 9902113
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1049066
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1049066
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G09B5/14, G09B7/02
[2002/45]
Former International [2000/44]G09B5/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:Bereitstellung von Lernmaterial über ein Kommunikationsnetzwerk[2000/44]
English:Provision of educational material over a communications network[2000/44]
French:Fourniture de materiel didactique sur un réseau de communications[2000/44]
Examination procedure29.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
17.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
02.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0279558  (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-48 * abstract * * figure - * * column 1, line 46 - line 64 * * column 3, line 6 - line 44 * * column 5, line 11 - column 15, line 4 *;
 [X]WO9522812  (PETERS GRAHAM [AU], et al) [X] 1-48 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * page 1 - page 10, line 16 *;
 [X]EP0772858  (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [X] 1-48 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US4907146  (CAPORALI GIANCARLO [IT]) [X] 1,10,21,45 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2, line 51 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4 * [A] 2-9,11-20,22-44,46-48;
 [XA]EP0479408  (HAMILTON ERIC R [US]) [X] 1,10,21,45 * the whole document * [A] 2-9,11-20,22-44,46-48;
 [X]GB2234104  (BRADFORD ALAN) [X] 1,10,21,45 * abstract * * figures 1,2.1,2.2,4.1,4.2,5 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 33 *;
 [X]US4715818  (SHAPIRO RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1,10,21,45 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * column 1 - column 2, line 18 *