Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039346

EP1039346 - Resist compositions and pattering process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.05.2005  [2005/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hatakeyama, Jun, c/o Speciality Chem. Res. Center
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd., 28-1 Oaza Nishifukushima
Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
02 / Kobayashi, Tomohiro, c/o Speciality Chem. Res. Cen
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd., 28-1 Oaza Nishifukushima
Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
03 / Watanabe, Osamu, c/o Speciality Chem. Res. Center
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd., 28-1 Oaza Nishifukushima
Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
04 / Takeda, Takanobu, c/o Speciality Chem. Res. Center
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd., 28-1 Oaza Nishifukushima
Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
05 / Ishihara, Toshinobu, c/o Speciality Chem. Res. Cen
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd., 28-1 Oaza Nishifukushima
Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
06 / Watanabe, Jun, c/o Speciality Chem. Res. Center
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd., 28-1 Oaza Nishifukushima
Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00302465.027.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateJP1999008288526.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8288599
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1039346
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039346
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/039, G03F7/038, G03F7/004, C08F12/22, C08F12/24
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/24]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Resistzusammensetzungen und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren[2000/39]
English:Resist compositions and pattering process[2000/39]
French:Compositions pour photoréserves et procédé de formation d'images[2000/39]
Examination procedure29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
11.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2004Fee for grant paid
26.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0908473  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1-7,10 * pages 69-74, polymers 7-12 * * page 78; example 9 * * claims 5,7,8,12 *;
 [X]EP0399691  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,5,8,10 * page 5; example 2 * * claims 1,7 *;
 [X]EP0397460  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,5,8,10 * example - * * claim - *;
 [X]US5587446  (FRECHET JEAN M J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 4 * * column 7 - column 8 *;
 [A]WO9903898  (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 9 - line 12 *;
 [A]JPH1129617
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 15, Database accession no. 1999-175685, XP002142895 & JPH1129617 A 19990202 (NIPPON SODA CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0537524