Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046473

EP1046473 - Pivotable and flexible razor assembly and cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road Morris Plains
New Jersey 07950 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/40]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Richard, Paul D.
22 Woodsend Avenue
Shelton, Connecticut 06484 / US
02 / Pennella, Andrew J.
180 Blackwood Lane
Stamford, Connecticut 06903 / US
03 / Follo, Thomas A.
133 Lexington Way North
Milford, Connecticut 06460 / US
 [2003/40]
Former [2000/43]01 / Richard, Paul D.
22 Woodsend Avenue
Shelton, Connecticut06484 / US
02 / Pennella, Andrew J.
180 Blackwood Lane
Stamford, Connecticut 06903 / US
03 / Follo, Thomas A.
133 Lexington Way North
Milford, Connecticut 06460 / US
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Powell, Timothy John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date00302488.227.03.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateUS1999029587621.04.1999         Original published format: US 295876
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1046473
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046473
Date:01.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/40, B26B21/22
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/29]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schwenkbare und flexible Rasiereinheit[2003/40]
English:Pivotable and flexible razor assembly and cartridge[2000/43]
French:Cassette de rasage pivotable et flexible[2000/43]
Former [2000/43]Schwenkbare und flexibele Rasiereinheit
Examination procedure08.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
03.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2003Fee for grant paid
28.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9505272  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 4, line 4 - page 8, line 34; figures 1-14 *;
 [X]US5781997  (FERRARO FRANK ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,12-14 * column W *;
 [XY]US4443939  (MOTTA VINCENT C [US], et al) [X] 17 * column W * [Y] 18;
 [Y]GB2162111  (WILKINSON SWORD LTD) [Y] 18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9529798  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 17 * page 5, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 4-6 *
by applicantUS5475923
 US5056221
 US4044120
 US5095619