Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043289

EP1043289 - Low stress, water-clear zinc sulfide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Goela, Jitendra S.
12 Messina Drive
Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Former [2000/41]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date00302492.427.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateUS1999028789307.04.1999         Original published format: US 287893
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1043289
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043289
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/547, G02B1/02, C23C16/00
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/26]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spannungsarmes, wasserklares Zinksulfid[2000/41]
English:Low stress, water-clear zinc sulfide[2000/41]
French:Sulfure de zinc ayant une transparence comme l'eau et étant pauvre en tensions[2000/41]
Examination procedure07.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
27.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2002Fee for grant paid
21.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0157040  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-21 * page 7, line 24 - line 27; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US4944900  (WILLINGHAM CHARLES B [US], et al) [AD] 1-21 * claims 1-9 *