EP1043849 - Splitter for use with an optical amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems Optoelectronics Guardian Corporation 9333 South John Young Parkway Orlando Florida 32819-8698 / US | [2006/43] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Agere Systems Optoelectronics Guardian Corporation 9333 South John Young Parkway Orlando, Florida 32819-8698 / US | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arney, Susanne 130 North 6th Street Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US | 02 /
Legrange, Jane Deborah 85 Wilson Road Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [2000/41] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302506.1 | 28.03.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | US19990287475 | 06.04.1999 Original published format: US 287475 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043849 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043849 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043849 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
G02B6/3512 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/06708 (EP,KR,US);
H01S3/06754 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/2817 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/3514 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/3548 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/05] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verzweiger zur Verwendung mit einem optischen Verstärker | [2000/41] | English: | Splitter for use with an optical amplifier | [2000/41] | French: | Séparateur utilisé avec un amplificateur optique | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6010219 ; | [Y]EP0497243 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [Y] 4-7 * column 4, line 23 - line 32 * * figure 4 *; | [XY]EP0779687 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 6 - line 22 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4-12; | [Y]WO9812589 (ASCOM TECH AG [CH], et al) [Y] 8-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850531), vol. 009, no. 127, Database accession no. (P - 360), & JP60010219 A 19850119 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 8-12 * abstract * |