Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040797

EP1040797 - Corneal surgery apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho Gamagori-shi
Aichi 443-0035 / JP
[2007/01]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho
Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0035 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Takua
1-22 Kuchinawazuka, Hiroishi, Mito-cho
Hoi-gun, Aichi 441-0321 / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00302527.728.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999009380931.03.1999         Original published format: JP 9380999
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1040797
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1040797
Date:10.10.2001
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040797
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/01
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/27]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Chirurgie der Hornhaut[2000/40]
English:Corneal surgery apparatus[2000/40]
French:Dispositif pour la chirurgie cornéenne[2000/40]
Examination procedure22.03.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
11.04.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.08.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
04.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2006Fee for grant paid
30.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5800424  (SUMIYA TOSHIFUMI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 20 - line 31; figure 8 *;
 [A]US5735276  (LEMELSON JEROME [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 49 - line 59 *;
 [A]DE19702335  (WAVELIGHT LASER TECHNOLOGIE GM [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 11 - line 18 *