Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043759

EP1043759 - Method for processing silicon workpieces using hybrid optical thermometer system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2012  [2012/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Alers, Glenn B.
1771 Redwood Drive
Santa Cruz, CA 05060 / US
02 / Fiory, Anthony Thomas
24 Laurel Avenue
Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US
03 / Sun, Don X.
48 Scheurman Terrace
Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US
04 / Thomas, Gordon Albert
107 Randall Road
Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [2000/41]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date00302537.628.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateUS1999028692906.04.1999         Original published format: US 286929
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043759
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043759
Date:19.10.2005
[2005/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043759
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/26]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Siliziumwerkstücken mittels eines hybriden optischen Thermometerssystems[2011/12]
English:Method for processing silicon workpieces using hybrid optical thermometer system[2000/41]
French:Méthode de traitement de pièces en silicium utilisant un système hybride à thermomètre optique[2000/41]
Former [2000/41]Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Silikonwerkstücken mittels eines hybriden optischen Thermometerssystems
Examination procedure18.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/23]
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2011Fee for grant paid
05.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2007
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200405   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[XPD]US6002113  (ALERS GLENN B [US], et al) [XPD] 1-3 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0886303  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 3 *;
 [A]US5568978  (JOHNSON SHANE R [CA], et al) [A] 1,4,1,4