EP1043868 - Optoelectronic network interface device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Change or deletion - publication of search report | published on 02.08.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ford, Joseph Earl 446 West Lincoln Avenue Oakhurst, New Jersey 07755 / US | 02 /
Krishnamoorthy, Ashok V. 1002 Knollwood Drive Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302539.2 | 28.03.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | US19990287533 | 07.04.1999 Original published format: US 287533 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043868 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [2002/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043868 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/44, H04B10/20 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0003 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0067 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für eine optoelektrische Netzwerkschnittstelle | [2000/41] | English: | Optoelectronic network interface device | [2000/41] | French: | Dispositif d'interface opto-éléctronique de réseau | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4953155 (TANGONAN GREGORY L [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column A * * column 1, line 60, paragraph 65 * * column 2, line 11 - line 26 * * column 3, line 16 - line 21 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X] - KRISHNAMOORTHY A V ET AL, "THE AMOEBA SWITCH: AN OPTOELECTRONIC SWITCH FOR MULTIPROCESSOR NETWORKING USING DENSE-WDM", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (199903), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1077-260X, pages 261 - 274, XP000865286 [X] 1-16 * page 261, column R, line 40 - line 47 * * page 262, column L, line 32 - line 42 * * page 262, column R, line 33 - line 34 * * page 262, column R, line 46 - line 49 * * page 264, column L, line 34 - line 36 * * page 264, column L, line 46 - line 53 * * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2944.778301 | [XP] - SUPMONCHAI B ET AL, "An optoelectronic CMOS switch core for a Terabit optical local area network", PARALLEL INTERCONNECTS, 1999. (PI '99). PROCEEDINGS. THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANCHORAGE, AK, USA 17-19 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991017), ISBN 0-7695-0440-X, pages 35 - 42, XP010360356 [XP] 1,5-12,15,16 * Section 1 - Introduction * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PI.1999.806393 | [A] - MAK G ET AL, "WAVEGUIDE-DETECTOR COUPLERS FOR INTEGRATED OPTICS AND MONOLITHIC OPTOELECTRONIC SWITCHING ARRAYS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, US, (19891101), vol. 28, no. 21, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 4629 - 4636, XP000071202 [A] 1-16 * page 4629, column L, line 1 - column R, line 19 * * page 4629, column R, line 11 - line 34 * * page 4630, column L, line 30 - line 35 * * page 4633, column R, lines 31-36 * * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.28.004629 | [A] - DENZEL W E ET AL, "Photonics in the backbone of corporate networks - the ACTS COBNET project", PHOTONIC NETWORKS, OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY AND INFRASTRUCTURE. NOC '97, PROCEEDINGS OF NOC '97. (NETWORK AND OPT. COMM.), ANTWERP, BELGIUM, 17-19 JUNE 1997, 1997, Amsterdam, Netherlands, IOS Press, Netherlands, ISBN 90-5199-341-2, pages 25 - 32, XP001085182 [A] 1-16 *1. Introduction*;; figure 1 * | [A] - ZHOU P ET AL, "MONOLITHIC OPTOELECTRONIC SWITCH BASED ON THE INTEGRATION OF A CAVITY SURFACE-EMITTING LASER. GAAS/ALGAAS HETEROJUNCTION BIPOLAR TRANSISTOR AND A GAAS VERTICAL-", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19930901), vol. 5, no. 9, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1035 - 1038, XP000414171 [A] 9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.257183 | [A] - KRISHNAMOORTHY A V ET AL, "VERTICAL-CAVITY SURFACE-EMITTING LASERS FLIP-CHIP BONDED TO GIGABIT-PER-SECOND CMOS CIRCUITS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199901), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 128 - 130, XP000801407 [A] 9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.736418 |