Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043168

EP1043168 - Thermal printer and recording method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Katano, Keiji, c/o Alps Electric Co., Ltd.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
02 / Hiratsuka, Kazuhiko, c/o Alps Electric Co., Ltd.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date00302583.029.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateJP1999009928206.04.1999         Original published format: JP 9928299
JP1999010248409.04.1999         Original published format: JP 10248499
JP1999025685910.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25685999
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043168
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043168
Date:31.01.2001
[2001/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043168
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J19/20
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/42]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Thermodrucker und deren Aufzeichnungsverfahren[2000/41]
English:Thermal printer and recording method thereof[2000/41]
French:Imprimante thermique et son procédé d'enregistrement[2000/41]
Examination procedure31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2002Fee for grant paid
11.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0664221  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPS5784877  ;
 [A]EP0581403  (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 6, line 25 - line 32; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0514038  (MITSUBISHI STEEL MFG [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 1, line 25 - line 27 * * column 3, lines 16-20 *;
 [A]EP0694393  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 10, line 57 - line 58 *;
 [A]JPH1148510  ;
 [A]EP0585881  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 3,4,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5434602  (KABURAGI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 3,4,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0634279  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 3,4,7,8 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820907), vol. 006, no. 172, Database accession no. (M - 154), [X] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, [A] 3,4,7,8 * abstract *