Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043231

EP1043231 - Sealless strapping tool and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2005  [2005/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Crittenden, David E.
1325 Chartwell Road
Schaumburg, Illinois 60195 / US
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date00302617.629.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateUS1999028922109.04.1999         Original published format: US 289221
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043231
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043231
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65B13/30
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:Werkzeug und Verfahren zum verschlusslosen Umreifen[2000/41]
English:Sealless strapping tool and method[2000/41]
French:Outil et procédé pour le cerclage sans fermeture séparée[2000/41]
Examination procedure31.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/31]
14.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/11]
15.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AX]DE892277  (TIMMERBEIL ERICH, et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 121 - page 3, line 20; figures 1-5 * [X] 9;
 [A]EP0671325  (SIGNODE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 *