Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1065645

EP1065645 - Plasma display unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2012  [2012/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Plasma Patent Licensing Co., Ltd.
2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/20]
Former [2006/05]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kojima, Ayahito, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
02 / Wakayama, Hiroyuki, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
03 / Kuriyama, Hirohito, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
04 / Ishida, Katsuhiro, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Akira, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
 [2011/19]
Former [2010/51]01 / Kojima, Ayahito, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Displ. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
02 / Wakayama, Hiroyuki, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Di. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
03 / Kuriyama, Hirohito, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Di. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
04 / Ishida, Katsuhiro, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Di. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Akira, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Disp. Ldt.
2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
Former [2001/01]01 / Kojima, Ayahito, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Displ. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-come,Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
02 / Wakayama, Hiroyuki, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Di. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-come,Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
03 / Kuriyama, Hirohito, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Di. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-come,Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
04 / Ishida, Katsuhiro, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Di. Ldt
2-1, Sakado 3-come,Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Akira, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Disp. Ldt.
2-1, Sakado 3-come,Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]Fenlon, Christine Lesley , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date00302725.731.03.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateJP1999018546830.06.1999         Original published format: JP 18546899
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1065645
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1065645
Date:11.12.2002
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1065645
Date:18.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/28
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/36]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Plasma-Anzeigeeinheit[2001/01]
English:Plasma display unit[2001/01]
French:Unité d'affichage à plasma[2001/01]
Examination procedure26.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
21.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2011Fee for grant paid
21.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9930309  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - page 9, line 6 * * page 25, line 3 - page 26, line 10 * * page 36, line 23 - page 37, line 16; figure 11 * [A] 4;
 [AD]EP0653740  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 56 * * page 7, line 53 - page 9, line 21 * * page 10, line 3 - line 25; figures 7-11 *;
 [A]EP0841652  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 28; figures 1-3 *
ExaminationFR2738377
by applicantFR2738377