Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044738

EP1044738 - A metal basket forming machine with a spacer device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/42]A spacer device for a metal basket forming machine
[2001/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ian Wood & Barry Wood Trading In Partnership As J.&C.R. Wood
66 Clough Road Hull
East Yorkshire HU5 1SR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
Ian Wood & Barry Wood Trading In Partnership As J.&C.R. Wood
66 Clough Road
Hull, East Yorkshire HU5 1SR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Wood, Ian
177 Woodhall Way
Beverley, East Yorkshire HU17 7JU / GB
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Walker, Antony James Alexander
W.P. Thompson & Co., Kings Building, South Church Side
Hull, HU1 1RR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Walker, Antony James Alexander
W.P. Thomson & Co., Kings Building, South Church Side
Hull, HU1 1RR / GB
Application number, filing date00302849.504.04.2000
[2000/42]
Priority number, dateGB1999000797009.04.1999         Original published format: GB 9907970
[2000/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044738
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044738
Date:19.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B21D11/14
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   GB [2001/27]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Eine Maschine zur Herstellung von Körben aus Metall mit einem Abstandshalter[2001/45]
English:A metal basket forming machine with a spacer device[2001/36]
French:Une machine pour fabriquer des corbeilles en métal avec une pièce d'ecartement[2001/36]
Former [2000/42]Abstandshalter für eine Maschine zur Herstellung von Korben aus Metall
Former [2000/42]A spacer device for a metal basket forming machine
Former [2000/42]Pièce d'écartement pour une machine pour fabriquer des corbeilles en métal
Examination procedure06.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/23]
01.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2002Fee for grant paid
02.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19715081  (LIEBLER HANS HEINRICH [PH]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *;
 [AD]WO9718908  (BEECHER ROY [GB], et al) [AD] 1-10 * figure 5 *