blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1043906

EP1043906 - Method and system facilitating web based provisioning of two-way mobile communications devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phone.Com Inc.
800 Chesapeake Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2000/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Dusse, Steve
655 Manzanita Way
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London, W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2000/41]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date00302963.407.04.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateUS1999028955909.04.1999         Original published format: US 289559
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043906
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043906
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/32, H04L29/06
[2000/41]
CPC:
H04L67/34 (EP,KR,US); H04W8/245 (KR); H04L67/51 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,KR,US); H04W12/06 (EP,KR,US); H04W12/35 (EP,US);
H04W12/69 (KR); H04W4/50 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Erleichterung der Bereitstellung von auf Web basierte zweiweg mobile Übertragungseinrichtungen[2000/41]
English:Method and system facilitating web based provisioning of two-way mobile communications devices[2000/41]
French:Procédé et système pour facilité la fourniture basé sur le Web de dispositifs de communication mobile bidirectionelle[2000/41]
Examination procedure02.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
17.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/51]
07.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9515065  (BELLSOUTH INT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 23 - line 34 * * page 6, line 27 - page 11, line 15 * * page 14, line 25 - line 31 * * page 19, line 4 - page 20, line 19 * * page 21, line 11 - line 17 * * page 25, paragraph 2 * * page 26, paragraph 3 *;
 [XA]WO9728662  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * page 3, lines 3-26 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 31 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 19 * * page 15, line 19 - line 22 * * page 1, line 22 - line 24 * * page 15, paragraph 2 * [A] 3,7;
 [X]US5719918  (SERBETCIOUGLU BEKIR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 8 * * column 5, line 57 - column 17, line 14; figures 3-7A,8,9,12,13 *;
 [A]WO9907173  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-10* page 1, line 7 - page 8, line 24 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.