EP1045036 - Methods and devices for performing analysis of a nucleic acid sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states bioMerieux, Inc. 595 Anglum Drive Hazelwood Missouri 63042-2905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Biomerieux, Inc. 595 Anglum Drive, Hazelwood Missouri 63042-2905 / US | ||
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Biomerieux, Inc. 595 Anglum Drive, Hazelwood Missouri 63042-2905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rogers, Charles H. 509 Monponsett Street Halifax, Massachusetts 02338 / US | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford Kent TN30 6UG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford Kent TN30 6UG / GB | ||
Former [2005/41] | Froud, Clive 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford Kent TN30 6UG / GB | ||
Former [2000/42] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302976.6 | 07.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | US19990291566 | 13.04.1999 Original published format: US 291566 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1045036 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1045036 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045036 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G01N35/00584 (EP,US);
C12Q1/68 (KR);
G01N35/00603 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2656 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/42] | C12Q1/68, B01J19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen um die Analyse einer Nukleinsäureprobe durchzuführen | [2000/42] | English: | Methods and devices for performing analysis of a nucleic acid sample | [2000/42] | French: | Méthodes et apparéils pour analyser un échantillon d'acide nucléique | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5693467 (ROBLIN III RICHARD O [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 4, line 13 - line 52 * * claims 1-18 *; | [DA]EP0875584 (BIO MERIEUX VITEK INC [US]) [DA] 1-25 * abstract * * examples 3,5 * * figure 15 *; | [A]US5858732 (SOLOMON NATALIE A [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * claims 1-13 *; | [E]EP1003120 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [E] 1-25 * abstract * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 24 ** claims 1-14 *; | [A] - TEVERE V J ET AL, "Detection of Mycobacterium tuberculosis by PCR amplification with pan-Mycobacterium primers and hybridization to an M. tuberculosis-specific probe", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199604), vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 918 - 923, XP002252655 [A] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - GINGERAS THOMAS R ET AL, "Simultaneous genotyping and species identification using hybridization pattern recognition analysis of generic Mycobacterium DNA arrays", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, (199805), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 435 - 448, XP002156298 [A] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - HEAD S R ET AL, "Solid-phase sequence scanning for drug resistance detection in tuberculosis", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (199904), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0890-8508, pages 81 - 87, XP004450191 [A] 1-25 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1998.0212 | [A] - TROESCH ET AL, "MYCOBACTERIUM SPECIES IDENTIFICATION AND RIFAMPICIN RESISTANCE TESTING WITH HIGH-DENSITY DNA PROBE ARRAYS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199901), vol. 37, no. 1, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 49 - 55, XP002130858 [A] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - MARKS G LYNN, "Genetics of tuberculosis", MEDICAL CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, (1993), vol. 77, no. 6, ISSN 0025-7125, pages 1219 - 1234, XP009023490 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - NELSON N C, "RAPID DETECTION OF GENETIC MUTATIONS USING THE CHEMILUMINESCENT HYBRIDIZATION PROTECTION ASSAY (HPA): OVERVIEW AND COMPARISON WITH OTHER METHODS", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN CLINICAL LABORATORY SCIENCES, CRC PRESS, BACA RATON, FL, US, (199809), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 1040-8363, pages 369 - 414, XP009010933 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10408369891234228 |