Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043201

EP1043201 - Electric ignition type gas generation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Showa Kinzoku Kogyo Co., Ltd.
2120 Iwase, Iwase-machi Nishiibaraki-gun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
[2007/08]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Showa Kinzoku Kogyo Co., Ltd.
2120 Iwase, Iwase-machi
Nishiibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Narumi, Kazuhito
3-8-6 Cyuo, Tomobe-machi, Nishiibaraki-gun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Araki, Ikuo
772 Okazeri
Shimodate-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Morinaga, Hiroki
208-219 Ota-cho, Tomobe-machi
Nashiibaraki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Smith, Norman Ian , et al
Cleveland
40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Smith, Norman Ian , et al
fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date00302989.910.04.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateJP1999010209209.04.1999         Original published format: JP 10209299
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043201
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043201
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043201
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/26, F42B3/12, F42B3/26
[2002/48]
Former International [2000/41]B60R21/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:Gaserzeugungsvorrichtung mit elektrischer Anzündung[2000/41]
English:Electric ignition type gas generation apparatus[2000/41]
French:Appareil générateur de gaz à allumage électrique[2000/41]
Examination procedure20.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/29]
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2006Fee for grant paid
18.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
IE10.04.2007
LU10.04.2007
MC30.04.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
IE10.04.2007
MC30.04.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2009/18]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
IE10.04.2007
MC30.04.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/23]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
IE10.04.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/19]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
Former [2007/40]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
Former [2007/38]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
Former [2007/37]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
Former [2007/36]FI21.02.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5634660  (FINK OTTO [DE], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]EP0802092  (MORTON INT INC [US]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH07149202  ;
 [X]US5142982  (DIEPOLD GISELA [DE], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5763814  (AVORY MARK LUCAS [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4621578  (VALLIERES YVES [FR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0779492  (MORTON INT INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07149202 A 19950613 (NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 3 * abstract *