EP1052546 - Substrate handler for use in lithographic projection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110, Building 2 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states ASM LITHOGRAPHY B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Segers, Hubert Marie Munteltuinen 10 5212 's Hertogenbosch / NL | 02 /
Boon, Rudolf Maria Eimerick 22 5653 RM Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Bijnagte, Anton Adriaan Kerkstraat 10 4196 AB Tricht / NL | 04 /
Jacobs, Fransiscus Mathijs Eikelaar 91 5721 DE Asten / NL | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302997.2 | 10.04.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | EP19990201223 | 21.04.1999 Original published format: EP 99201223 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1052546 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1052546 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052546 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
G03F7/707 (EP);
G03F7/70358 (EP);
G03F7/70716 (EP);
G03F7/7075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/32] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Substrathandhabungsvorrichtung zur Verwendung in lithographischen Projektionsapparaten | [2000/46] | English: | Substrate handler for use in lithographic projection apparatus | [2000/46] | French: | Manipulateur de substrats pour utilisation dans appareils de projection lithographique | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3865254 (JOHANNSMEIER KARL-HEINZ) [A] 1 * column 4 - column 8; figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO9840791 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 5 - page 13; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4655584 (TANAKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3 - column 9; figures 1-9 * |