Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043817

EP1043817 - Light emitting module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayashi, Hideki, Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd.
1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00303003.810.04.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateJP1999010126308.04.1999         Original published format: JP 10126399
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043817
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043817
Date:28.01.2004
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/022, H01S5/026, G02B6/42
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [2004/43]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lichtemittierendes Modul[2000/41]
English:Light emitting module[2000/41]
French:Module à émission de lumière[2000/41]
Examination procedure23.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/26]
24.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
08.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.09.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5418802  (CHWALEK JAMES M [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * column 1 - column 4 * * abstract * [Y] 2-5;
 [A]JPS6464282  (NIPPON DENSO CO) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - K C REICHMANN, P D MAGILL, U KOREN, B I MILLER, M YOUNG, M NEWKIRK AND M D CHIEN, "2.5Gb/s transmission ovre 674km at multiple wavelengths using a tunable DBR laser with an integrated electroabsorption modulator", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (199309), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 1098 - 1100, XP000414187 [Y] 2-5 * page 1098; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.257204
 [A]  - DELORME F ET AL, "ULTRA-FAST OPTICAL SWITCHING OPERATION OF DBR LASERS USING AN ELECTRO-OPTICAL TUNING SECTION", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19950301), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 269 - 271, XP000510268 [A] 1-7 * page 269 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.372742
 [A]  - WILSON G C ET AL, "INTEGRATED ELECTROABSORPTION MODULATOR/DBR LASER LINEARIZED BY RF CURRENT MODULATION", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19951001), vol. 7, no. 10, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1154 - 1156, XP002014851 [A] 1-7 * page 1154 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.466574