Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043091

EP1043091 - Method of moulding metal using high fluid pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aida Engineering Co., Ltd.
2-10, Ohyama-cho Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Aida Engineering Co., Ltd.
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Aida Engineering Co., Ltd.
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-11 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayahshi, Kazuto, Aida Engineering
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
02 / Kanamaru, Hisanobu, Aida Engineering
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
03 / Matsumura, Akira, Aida Engineering
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP
 [2001/03]
Former [2000/41]01 / Kobayahshi, Kazuto, Aida Engineering
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, KAnagawa 229-11 / JP
02 / Kanemaru, Katsunobu, Aida Engineering
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, KAnagawa 229-11 / JP
03 / Matsumura, Akira, Aida Engineering
2-10, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, KAnagawa 229-11 / JP
Representative(s)Bryer, Kenneth Robert , et al
Bryers LLP
7 Gay Street
Bath
BA1 2PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Bryer, Kenneth Robert , et al
K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street
Bath BA1 2PH / GB
Application number, filing date00303018.610.04.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateJP1999010244809.04.1999         Original published format: JP 10244899
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043091
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043091
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043091
Date:19.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B21D26/02, B21J5/04
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/04]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hochdruckumformverfahren zum Formen von Metall[2000/41]
English:Method of moulding metal using high fluid pressure[2000/41]
French:Méthode de formage de métal par haute pression[2000/41]
Examination procedure15.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
03.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.05.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2003Fee for grant paid
06.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.02.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.02.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3592034  (MCMEEN FORREST H, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 9, line 42 - line 60; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]JPS56136234  ;
 [A]US4008599  (DOHMANN FRITZ) [A] 1,7 * figure - *;
 [A]US3722245  (YAMAGUCHI Y, et al) [A] 1-5,7,9 * figure 1D *;
 [A]US5022135  (MILLER DONALD E [US], et al);
 [A]US4788843  (SEAMAN ROY C [US], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820130), vol. 006, no. 017, Database accession no. (M - 109), [A] 4-6,9,10 * abstract *